Texas 2021 - 87th 2nd C.S.

Texas Senate Bill SJR3 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill August 7, 2021

Engrossed

Bill August 9, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill August 23, 2021
Bill August 7, 2021

Analysis

Analysis August 20, 2021
Analysis August 7, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note August 19, 2021
Fiscal Note August 7, 2021