10/25/2021 | Signed by the Governor | |||
10/19/2021 | Sent to the Governor | |||
Senate | 10/18/2021 | Signed in the Senate | ||
House | 10/18/2021 | Signed in the House | ||
House | 10/18/2021 | Reported enrolled | ||
House | 10/18/2021 | Senate passage reported | ||
Senate | 10/18/2021 | Record vote | ||
Senate | 10/18/2021 | Read | ||
Senate | 10/18/2021 | Laid before the Senate | ||
Senate | 10/18/2021 | Rules suspended | ||
Senate | 10/18/2021 | Adopted | ||
Senate | 10/17/2021 | Received from the House | ||
House | 10/17/2021 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | ||
House | 10/17/2021 | Record vote RV#132 | ||
House | 10/17/2021 | Laid before the House | ||
House | 10/16/2021 | Placed on Resolutions Calendar | ||
House | 10/15/2021 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 10/14/2021 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 10/13/2021 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 10/13/2021 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | ||
House | 10/13/2021 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 10/13/2021 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 10/13/2021 | Scheduled for formal meeting on . . . | ||
House | 09/27/2021 | Referred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism | ||
House | 09/21/2021 | Filed |