Texas 2021 - 87th 3rd C.S.

Texas House Bill HR6 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 10/07/2021

                            H.R. No. 6


 R E S O L U T I O N
 WHEREAS, Family and friends will forever treasure their
 memories of Kenneth Arlan Bostrom, who passed away on August 21,
 2021, at the age of 72, and his wife, Mary Elizabeth Bostrom, who
 passed away on August 24, 2021, at the age of 72; and
 WHEREAS, A native of Montevideo, Minnesota, Ken Bostrom was
 born on July 21, 1949, to John and Nelinda Bostrom, and he grew up
 with the companionship of six siblings, Cindy, Joy, Linda, Mary
 Ann, Darrell, and Larrie; after graduating from Montevideo High
 School in 1967, he served in the U.S. Navy; he was later employed by
 the Farmers Union Grain Terminal Association for more than a
 decade, and during his tenure, he worked in radio broadcasting as a
 DJ; he went on to host his own TV program in Aberdeen, South Dakota,
 before embarking on a 29-year career as a state licensed consultant
 at Brown Hearing Centers in Orange, Texas; and
 WHEREAS, The former Mary Brown was born in Balaton,
 Minnesota, on July 11, 1949, to Charles and Elnora Brown, and she
 grew up with five siblings, Betty, E. Anne, Corinne, Charlene, and
 Charles; a 1967 graduate of Echo High School, she worked in home
 daycare before joining Feinstein's department store; she
 subsequently enjoyed a rewarding career in the banking industry,
 and she later served as church administrator at Church of the Living
 God in Galveston; over the years, she studied at the American
 Bankers Association, and she earned a certificate from Rhema
 Correspondence Bible School; and
 WHEREAS, Mr. and Mrs. Bostrom shared a loving marriage that
 spanned more than five decades, and together they answered the call
 to the ministry; they graduated from Wisdom Bible Institute in
 1994, Mr. Bostrom as valedictorian, and Mrs. Bostrom went on to
 become an instructor for the school; they were later ordained
 through World Ministry Fellowship, where Mr. Bostrom served as
 board chair and Texas Gulf Coast state director for over a decade;
 in addition, they founded Ken Bostrom Ministries in 2000, and they
 both earned doctor of ministry degrees in theology from the College
 for Global Deployment; and
 WHEREAS, Deeply devoted to their family, Mr. and
 Mrs. Bostrom were the parents of three children, Shannon, Jennifer,
 and the late Jyl Grey Anderson, and they were further blessed with
 six grandchildren, McKinley, Delaney, Kennedy, Jacob, Maxwell, and
 Samantha; and
 WHEREAS, Through their commitment to their faith and to their
 loved ones, Ken and Mary Bostrom touched the lives of countless
 people during their time on this earth, and they will long be
 remembered with admiration and affection by all those who held them
 dear; now, therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the House of Representatives of the 87th Texas
 Legislature, 3rd Called Session, hereby pay tribute to the memory
 of Kenneth and Mary Bostrom and extend heartfelt sympathy to their
 relatives and many friends; and, be it further
 RESOLVED, That an official copy of this resolution be
 prepared for their family and that when the Texas House of
 Representatives adjourns this day, it do so in memory of Ken and
 Mary Bostrom.
 Middleton
 ______________________________
 Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.R. No. 6 was unanimously adopted by a rising
 vote of the House on September 30, 2021.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House