Texas 2021 - 87th 3rd C.S.

Texas House Bill HR73 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 10/18/2021

                            H.R. No. 73


 R E S O L U T I O N
 WHEREAS, The untimely passing of Kori Freeman Crow of Austin
 on September 21, 2021, at the age of 43, has brought a heartbreaking
 loss to her family, friends, and colleagues; and
 WHEREAS, Born on March 14, 1978, in Landstuhl, Germany, to
 Mike and Starr Freeman, the former Kori Freeman grew up with the
 companionship of a sister, Lacey; during her childhood, she moved
 with her family to El Paso and then to Central Texas, where she
 graduated from Round Rock High School in 1996; while at Round Rock
 High, she served as editor of the school newspaper and had a
 memorable stint as the school's dragon mascot; she also
 participated in a number of local political campaigns; and
 WHEREAS, From the age of eight, when she idolized
 then-President Ronald Reagan, she had set her sights on a career in
 politics; she majored in communications at Concordia University
 Texas in Austin, and she went on to meet her future husband, Chad
 Crow, while running her first political campaign; the couple were
 married on May 26, 2002, at a ceremony in Round Rock; together with
 her husband, Ms. Crow founded a political consulting firm called KC
 Strategies that has worked on more than 300 campaigns over the
 course of two decades; in 2017, she was honored with the Texas
 Blazing Star Award from the Women's Chamber of Commerce of Texas,
 and that same year, she was recognized as one of the 40 best
 campaign professionals under age 40 by the American Association of
 Political Consultants; and
 WHEREAS, Ms. Crow and her husband shared a love of travel
 that led them to live in six different countries and to visit at
 least 60 others; despite the demands of her work, she was able to
 have many adventures in far-flung places, which included earning a
 culinary arts degree in Argentina, becoming a certified master
 scuba instructor in Honduras, and attending an audience in Rome
 with Pope John Paul II; in 2019, the Crows were blessed with a son,
 Francis, while they were living on Vancouver Island in Canada; and
 WHEREAS, Kori Crow lived a rich and vibrant life, and she will
 forever be remembered with deep affection by all who were fortunate
 enough to know her; now, therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the House of Representatives of the 87th Texas
 Legislature, 3rd Called Session, hereby pay tribute to the memory
 of Kori Freeman Crow and extend heartfelt sympathy to the members of
 her family: to her husband, Chad Crow; to her son, Francis Crow; to
 her parents, Mike and Starr Freeman; to her sister, Lacey Eaton, and
 her husband, Bill; to her niece, Samantha Davis, and nephew, Toby
 Eaton; to her father- and mother-in-law, Joe and Pat Crow; to her
 uncles and aunts, Pat and Cindy Keith and Joey and Norma Keith; to
 her cousin, Kelly Higdon; and to her other relatives and friends;
 and, be it further
 RESOLVED, That an official copy of this resolution be
 prepared for her family and that when the Texas House of
 Representatives adjourns this day, it do so in memory of Kori Crow.
 Burns
 Stucky
 Murr
 Smith
 Darby
 VanDeaver
 ______________________________
 Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.R. No. 73 was unanimously adopted by a rising
 vote of the House on October 14, 2021.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House