Texas 2021 - 87th 3rd C.S.

Texas Senate Bill SB20 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 09/08/2021

                            By: Hall S.B. No. 20


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to a forensic audit of 2020 election results in certain
 counties.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Title 16, Election Code, is amended by adding
 Chapter 280 to read as follows:
 CHAPTER 280. FORENSIC AUDIT OF 2020 GENERAL ELECTION
 Sec. 280.001.  FORENSIC AUDIT OF 2020 GENERAL ELECTION. (a)
 The Secretary of State and Attorney General shall conduct a joint
 forensic audit of the general election that took place on November
 3, 2020.
 (b)  The joint forensic audit conducted under Subsection (a)
 shall audit every precinct in each county where there is a
 discrepancy between the total number of votes counted and voters
 counted as having voted.
 (c)  The audit under this section must begin not later than
 November 1, 2021, and be completed not later than February 1, 2022.
 (d)  Not later than March 1, 2022, the results of the audit
 shall be submitted to the governor, lieutenant governor, speaker of
 the house of representatives, and each member of the legislature
 detailing any anomalies or discrepancies in voter data, ballot
 data, or tabulation.
 (e)  This chapter expires April 1, 2022.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect on the 91st day after the last day of the
 legislative session.