|
10/25/2021
|
Effective on . . . . . . . . . . . . . . . January 18, 2022
|
|
|
|
10/25/2021
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
|
10/19/2021
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
10/19/2021
|
Signed in the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/19/2021
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/19/2021
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/19/2021
|
House adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
|
House
|
10/19/2021
|
Record vote RV#152
|
|
|
House
|
10/19/2021
|
House adopts conference committee report
|
|
|
House
|
10/19/2021
|
Record vote RV#151
|
|
|
House
|
10/19/2021
|
Rules suspended
|
|
|
House
|
10/19/2021
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
|
House
|
10/18/2021
|
Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/18/2021
|
Senate adopts conference committee report
|
|
|
House
|
10/18/2021
|
Conf. Comm. Report distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/18/2021
|
Conference committee report filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/18/2021
|
House appoints conferees-reported
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/18/2021
|
House grants request for conf comm-reported
|
|
|
House
|
10/18/2021
|
House appoints conferees
|
|
|
House
|
10/18/2021
|
House grants request for conference committee
|
|
|
House
|
10/18/2021
|
Senate appoints conferees-reported
|
|
|
House
|
10/18/2021
|
Senate requests conference committee-reported
|
|
|
House
|
10/18/2021
|
Senate refuses to concur-reported
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/18/2021
|
Senate appoints conferees
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/18/2021
|
Senate requests conference committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/18/2021
|
Senate refuses to concur
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/18/2021
|
Read
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/18/2021
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/18/2021
|
Record vote
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/18/2021
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/17/2021
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
|
House
|
10/17/2021
|
Record vote RV#136
|
|
|
House
|
10/17/2021
|
Record vote RV#131
|
|
|
House
|
10/17/2021
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
|
House
|
10/17/2021
|
Point of order withdrawn Rule 4, Section 32(c)
|
|
|
House
|
10/17/2021
|
Record vote RV#130
|
|
|
House
|
10/17/2021
|
Amendment fails of adoption 8-Slaton
|
|
|
House
|
10/17/2021
|
Amendment withdrawn 7-Cason
|
|
|
House
|
10/17/2021
|
Point of order withdrawn (amendment) Rule 11, Section 2
|
|
|
House
|
10/17/2021
|
Amendment(s) offered 7-Cason
|
|
|
House
|
10/17/2021
|
Record vote RV#129
|
|
|
House
|
10/17/2021
|
Amended 6-Schaefer
|
|
|
House
|
10/17/2021
|
Record vote RV#128
|
|
|
House
|
10/17/2021
|
Amendment fails of adoption 5-C. Bell
|
|
|
House
|
10/17/2021
|
Record vote RV#127
|
|
|
House
|
10/17/2021
|
Amendment fails of adoption 4-C. Bell
|
|
|
House
|
10/17/2021
|
Record vote RV#126
|
|
|
House
|
10/17/2021
|
Amendment fails of adoption 3-Schaefer
|
|
|
House
|
10/17/2021
|
Record vote RV#125
|
|
|
House
|
10/17/2021
|
Amendment fails of adoption 2-Crockett
|
|
|
House
|
10/17/2021
|
Record vote RV#124
|
|
|
House
|
10/17/2021
|
Amendment fails of adoption 1-C. Bell
|
|
|
House
|
10/17/2021
|
Passed
|
|
|
House
|
10/17/2021
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
House
|
10/16/2021
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
10/16/2021
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
10/15/2021
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
10/06/2021
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
10/06/2021
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
10/06/2021
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
|
House
|
10/05/2021
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
10/05/2021
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
10/05/2021
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
10/05/2021
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
09/27/2021
|
Referred to State Affairs
|
|
|
House
|
09/27/2021
|
Read first time
|
|
|
House
|
09/23/2021
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/22/2021
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/22/2021
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/22/2021
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/22/2021
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/22/2021
|
Amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/22/2021
|
Amendment(s) offered FA1 Lucio
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/22/2021
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/20/2021
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/20/2021
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/20/2021
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/20/2021
|
Referred to Criminal Justice
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/20/2021
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/20/2021
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|