Texas 2021 - 87th 3rd C.S.

Texas Senate Bill SB5 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill September 20, 2021

Engrossed

Bill September 22, 2021

Enrolled

Bill October 19, 2021

Analysis

Analysis October 25, 2021
Analysis October 6, 2021
Analysis September 20, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note October 18, 2021
Fiscal Note October 4, 2021
Fiscal Note September 20, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill October 6, 2021
Bill September 20, 2021