|
10/25/2021
|
Effective on . . . . . . . . . . . . . . . January 18, 2022
|
|
|
|
10/25/2021
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
|
10/19/2021
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
10/19/2021
|
Signed in the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/19/2021
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/19/2021
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/18/2021
|
House adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
|
House
|
10/18/2021
|
Record vote RV#143
|
|
|
House
|
10/18/2021
|
House adopts conference committee report
|
|
|
House
|
10/18/2021
|
Point of order overruled Rule 13, Section 9(d)(1)
|
|
|
House
|
10/18/2021
|
Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/18/2021
|
Senate adopts conference committee report
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/18/2021
|
Record vote
|
|
|
House
|
10/17/2021
|
Conf. Comm. Report distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/17/2021
|
Conference committee report filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/17/2021
|
House appoints conferees-reported
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/17/2021
|
House grants request for conf comm-reported
|
|
|
House
|
10/17/2021
|
House appoints conferees
|
|
|
House
|
10/17/2021
|
House grants request for conference committee
|
|
|
House
|
10/17/2021
|
Senate appoints conferees-reported
|
|
|
House
|
10/17/2021
|
Senate requests conference committee-reported
|
|
|
House
|
10/17/2021
|
Senate refuses to concur-reported
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/17/2021
|
Senate appoints conferees
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/17/2021
|
Senate requests conference committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/17/2021
|
Senate refuses to concur
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/17/2021
|
Read
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/17/2021
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/17/2021
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
|
House
|
10/17/2021
|
Record vote RV#135
|
|
|
House
|
10/17/2021
|
Passed
|
|
|
House
|
10/17/2021
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
House
|
10/16/2021
|
Record vote RV#123
|
|
|
House
|
10/16/2021
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
|
House
|
10/16/2021
|
Record vote RV#122
|
|
|
House
|
10/16/2021
|
Amendment adopted as amended 24-Toth
|
|
|
House
|
10/16/2021
|
Amendment amended 26-Toth
|
|
|
House
|
10/16/2021
|
Amendment amended 25-Toth
|
|
|
House
|
10/16/2021
|
Amendment(s) offered 24-Toth
|
|
|
House
|
10/16/2021
|
Record vote RV#121
|
|
|
House
|
10/16/2021
|
Amended 23-Moody, Fierro, M. González, Ortega, and Ordaz Perez
|
|
|
House
|
10/16/2021
|
Record vote RV#120
|
|
|
House
|
10/16/2021
|
Amendment adopted as amended 21-Guillen
|
|
|
House
|
10/16/2021
|
Record vote RV#119
|
|
|
House
|
10/16/2021
|
Amendment amended 22-Guillen
|
|
|
House
|
10/16/2021
|
Amendment(s) offered 21-Guillen
|
|
|
House
|
10/16/2021
|
Record vote RV#118
|
|
|
House
|
10/16/2021
|
Amendment adopted as amended 19-Raney and Kacal
|
|
|
House
|
10/16/2021
|
Record vote RV#117
|
|
|
House
|
10/16/2021
|
Amendment amended 20-Raney
|
|
|
House
|
10/16/2021
|
Amendment(s) offered 19-Raney and Kacal
|
|
|
House
|
10/16/2021
|
Record vote RV#116
|
|
|
House
|
10/16/2021
|
Amendment adopted as amended 17-S. Thompson and Dutton
|
|
|
House
|
10/16/2021
|
Record vote RV#115
|
|
|
House
|
10/16/2021
|
Amendment amended 18-S. Thompson and Dutton
|
|
|
House
|
10/16/2021
|
Amendment(s) offered 17-S. Thompson and Dutton
|
|
|
House
|
10/16/2021
|
Amended 16-Collier
|
|
|
House
|
10/16/2021
|
Amendment withdrawn 14-Crockett
|
|
|
House
|
10/16/2021
|
Record vote RV#114
|
|
|
House
|
10/16/2021
|
Amendment to amendment fails of adoption 15-Crockett
|
|
|
House
|
10/16/2021
|
Amendment(s) offered 14-Crockett
|
|
|
House
|
10/16/2021
|
Record vote RV#113
|
|
|
House
|
10/16/2021
|
Amendment fails of adoption 13-Anchia
|
|
|
House
|
10/16/2021
|
Record vote RV#112
|
|
|
House
|
10/16/2021
|
Amendment adopted as amended 11-VanDeaver
|
|
|
House
|
10/16/2021
|
Record vote RV#111
|
|
|
House
|
10/16/2021
|
Amendment amended 12-Schofield
|
|
|
House
|
10/16/2021
|
Amendment(s) offered 11-VanDeaver
|
|
|
House
|
10/16/2021
|
Record vote RV#110
|
|
|
House
|
10/16/2021
|
Amendment fails of adoption 10-Anchia
|
|
|
House
|
10/16/2021
|
Record vote RV#109
|
|
|
House
|
10/16/2021
|
Amendment fails of adoption 9-Dominguez
|
|
|
House
|
10/16/2021
|
Record vote RV#108
|
|
|
House
|
10/16/2021
|
Amended 8-Landgraf
|
|
|
House
|
10/16/2021
|
Record vote RV#107
|
|
|
House
|
10/16/2021
|
Amendment fails of adoption 7-C. Turner, Collier, and Anchia
|
|
|
House
|
10/16/2021
|
Record vote RV#106
|
|
|
House
|
10/16/2021
|
Amendment fails of adoption 6-Davis
|
|
|
House
|
10/16/2021
|
Record vote RV#105
|
|
|
House
|
10/16/2021
|
Amendment fails of adoption 5-Anchia
|
|
|
House
|
10/16/2021
|
Record vote RV#104
|
|
|
House
|
10/16/2021
|
Amendment fails of adoption 4-Neave
|
|
|
House
|
10/16/2021
|
Record vote RV#103
|
|
|
House
|
10/16/2021
|
Amendment fails of adoption 3-Rose
|
|
|
House
|
10/16/2021
|
Record vote RV#102
|
|
|
House
|
10/16/2021
|
Amendment fails of adoption 2-C. Turner
|
|
|
House
|
10/16/2021
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
|
House
|
10/16/2021
|
Record vote RV#101
|
|
|
House
|
10/16/2021
|
Amendment fails of adoption 1-C. Turner
|
|
|
House
|
10/16/2021
|
Placed on Major State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
10/16/2021
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
10/15/2021
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
10/14/2021
|
Calendars Committee rule adopted
|
|
|
House
|
10/14/2021
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
10/14/2021
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
10/13/2021
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
|
House
|
10/13/2021
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
10/13/2021
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
10/13/2021
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
10/13/2021
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
10/08/2021
|
Referred to Redistricting
|
|
|
House
|
10/08/2021
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/08/2021
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/08/2021
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/08/2021
|
Amendment(s) offered FA12 Miles
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/08/2021
|
Amendment fails of adoption FA10 Gutierrez
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/08/2021
|
Amendment to amendment offered FA11 Gutierrez
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/08/2021
|
Amendment(s) offered FA10 Gutierrez
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/08/2021
|
Amendment withdrawn
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/08/2021
|
Amendment(s) offered FA9 Huffman
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/08/2021
|
Amendment(s) offered FA8 Miles
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/08/2021
|
Amendment(s) offered FA7 Hinojosa
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/08/2021
|
Amendment fails of adoption FA5 Gutierrez
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/08/2021
|
Amendment to amendment fails of adoption
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/08/2021
|
Amendment to amendment offered FA6 Gutierrez
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/08/2021
|
Amendment(s) offered FA5 Gutierrez
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/08/2021
|
Amendment(s) offered FA4 Menéndez
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/08/2021
|
Amendment fails of adoption
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/08/2021
|
Amendment(s) offered FA3 Blanco
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/08/2021
|
Amendment(s) offered FA2 Hughes
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/08/2021
|
Amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/08/2021
|
Amendment(s) offered FA1 Nichols
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/08/2021
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/08/2021
|
Ordered not printed
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/08/2021
|
Printing rule suspended
|
|
|
House
|
10/08/2021
|
Read first time
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/04/2021
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/04/2021
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/30/2021
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/27/2021
|
Referred to Redistricting, Special
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/27/2021
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/27/2021
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|