Texas 2021 - 87th 3rd C.S.

Texas Senate Bill SB6 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill September 27, 2021

Engrossed

Bill October 8, 2021

Enrolled

Bill October 19, 2021

Analysis

Analysis October 25, 2021
Analysis October 14, 2021
Analysis October 4, 2021
Analysis September 28, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note October 17, 2021
Fiscal Note October 12, 2021
Fiscal Note October 4, 2021
Fiscal Note September 27, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill October 14, 2021
Bill October 4, 2021