10/25/2021 | Signed by the Governor | |||
10/18/2021 | Sent to the Governor | |||
House | 10/18/2021 | Signed in the House | ||
Senate | 10/18/2021 | Signed in the Senate | ||
Senate | 10/18/2021 | Reported enrolled | ||
Senate | 10/17/2021 | House passage reported | ||
House | 10/17/2021 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | ||
House | 10/17/2021 | Record vote RV#133 | ||
House | 10/17/2021 | Laid before the House | ||
House | 10/17/2021 | Adopted | ||
House | 10/16/2021 | Placed on Resolutions Calendar | ||
House | 10/15/2021 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 10/14/2021 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 10/13/2021 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 10/13/2021 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | ||
House | 10/13/2021 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 10/13/2021 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 10/13/2021 | Scheduled for formal meeting on . . . | ||
House | 10/12/2021 | Meeting cancelled | ||
House | 10/08/2021 | Referred to Transportation | ||
House | 10/06/2021 | Received from the Senate | ||
Senate | 10/05/2021 | Vote recorded in Journal | ||
Senate | 10/05/2021 | Read 2nd time | ||
Senate | 10/05/2021 | Laid before the Senate | ||
Senate | 10/05/2021 | Co-author authorized | ||
Senate | 10/04/2021 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 10/04/2021 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | ||
Senate | 10/04/2021 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 10/04/2021 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 09/30/2021 | Read first time | ||
Senate | 09/22/2021 | Filed | ||
Senate | 09/22/2021 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |