10/25/2021 | Signed by the Governor | |||
10/19/2021 | Sent to the Governor | |||
House | 10/18/2021 | Signed in the House | ||
Senate | 10/18/2021 | Signed in the Senate | ||
Senate | 10/18/2021 | Reported enrolled | ||
Senate | 10/18/2021 | House passage reported | ||
House | 10/18/2021 | Adopted | ||
House | 10/18/2021 | Laid before the House | ||
House | 10/18/2021 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | ||
House | 10/13/2021 | Referred to Resolutions Calendars | ||
House | 10/12/2021 | Received from the Senate | ||
Senate | 10/12/2021 | Read & adopted | ||
Senate | 10/11/2021 | Filed | ||
Senate | 10/11/2021 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |