Texas 2021 - 87th 3rd C.S.

Texas Senate Bill SR38 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 09/30/2021

                            SENATE RESOLUTION NO. 38
 In Memory
 of
 John A. Hermann
 WHEREAS, The Senate of the State of Texas honors and
 commemorates the life of John A. Hermann, who died July 10, 2021,
 at the age of 74; and
 WHEREAS, John Hermann was born in Gonzales, Texas, on
 June 18, 1947; he moved to Brenham with his family during his
 high school years, and he graduated from Brenham High School and
 Blinn College; and
 WHEREAS, Mr. Hermann served with distinction in the Army
 National Guard and was stationed at Fort Polk, Louisiana, before
 being transferred to Fort Louis, Washington; he went on to have a
 rewarding life with a strong foundation built on faith, family,
 and community; and
 WHEREAS, John shared 53 years of marriage with Patsy
 Hermann, and they raised their daughter, Jennifer Jean Hermann,
 by loving spiritual example; they found great fulfillment in
 their years of service to Brenham's First Baptist Church, where
 they had married in 1968, and John was honored to serve the
 congregation as head of the Audio Visual Ministry and as a deacon
 for many years; and
 WHEREAS, This beloved Texan was admired as both a savvy
 businessman and a generous community steward; on May 15, 2014,
 the City of Brenham celebrated John Hermann Day to honor his 50
 years of leadership at Hermann Furniture; he was a director
 emeritus of the Brenham Maifest and a past president of the
 Downtown Association, and he was proud to have served as a master
 of the Grand Masonic Lodge; and
 WHEREAS, John was an avid hunter and fisherman, a devoted
 husband and father, and an esteemed leader in the Brenham
 community; he was beloved by many, and he will long be remembered
 with respect and admiration by all who were privileged to share
 in his life; now, therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the Senate of the State of Texas, 87th
 Legislature, 3rd Called Session, hereby extend sincere
 condolences to the bereaved family of John A. Hermann; and, be it
 further
 RESOLVED, That a copy of this Resolution be prepared for
 his family as an expression of deepest sympathy from the Texas
 Senate, and that when the Senate adjourns this day, it do so in
 memory of John Hermann.
 Kolkhorst
  ________________________________
  President of the Senate
  I hereby certify that the
  above Resolution was adopted by
  the Senate on September 30, 2021,
  by a rising vote.
  ________________________________
  Secretary of the Senate
  ________________________________
  Member, Texas Senate