Texas 2021 - 87th 3rd C.S.

Texas Senate Bill SR73 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 10/14/2021

                            SENATE RESOLUTION NO. 73
 In Memory
 of
 Raymundo J. Peña
 WHEREAS, The Senate of the State of Texas honors and
 commemorates the life of The Most Reverend Raymundo J. Peña
 bishop emeritus of Brownsville, who died September 24, 2021, at
 the age of 87; and
 WHEREAS, Raymundo Peña was born to Cosme and Elisa Peña on
 February 19, 1934, in Corpus Christi; he discerned a call to
 serve in the priesthood while growing up in Robstown, and he
 attended Saint John and Assumption Seminaries in San Antonio; and
 WHEREAS, Bishop Peña was ordained into the priesthood on
 May 25, 1957, at the Cathedral of Corpus Christi; his parish
 posts included serving as the diocesan youth director and as
 editor of the Texas Gulf Coast Catholic, the newspaper for the
 Corpus Christi Diocese; and
 WHEREAS, He was ordained a bishop in 1976 and was called to
 serve as auxiliary bishop of San Antonio, an assignment that
 included a six-month tenure as the administrator of the
 archdiocese; he went on to lead the Diocese of El Paso for 15
 years and was appointed bishop of Brownsville in 1995; he retired
 from the priesthood in 2009 as the longest-serving active
 Hispanic bishop in the nation; and
 WHEREAS, An esteemed leader in the Catholic church, Bishop
 Peña chaired multiple committees that addressed concerns of
 Hispanics in the United States and Latin America; he was a
 tireless and longstanding advocate for immigrants, especially
 for those coming into the United States from Mexico; and
 WHEREAS, In his service to the community, Bishop Peña fully
 lived his episcopal motto, 'Haz todo con amor,' or "Let all that
 you do be done in love"; he inspired countless citizens through
 his exemplary compassion and dedication to his work on behalf of
 others, and he will long be remembered with respect and
 admiration by the many who were blessed to share in his life; now,
 therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the Senate of the State of Texas, 87th
 Legislature, 3rd Called Session, hereby pay tribute to the life
 of The Most Reverend Raymundo J. Peña and extend heartfelt
 sympathy to his family and many friends; and, be it further
 RESOLVED, That a copy of this Resolution be prepared for
 Catholic Archives of Texas and that when the Senate adjourns this
 day, it do so in memory of the Reverend Raymundo J. Peña.
 Lucio
  ________________________________
  President of the Senate
  I hereby certify that the
  above Resolution was adopted by
  the Senate on October 14, 2021, by
  a rising vote.
  ________________________________
  Secretary of the Senate
  ________________________________
  Member, Texas Senate