Senate | 05/12/2023 | Referred to Health & Human Services | Journal Page: 1855 | |
Senate | 05/12/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1855 | |
Senate | 05/12/2023 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1820 | |
House | 05/11/2023 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 4221 | |
House | 05/11/2023 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3882 | |
House | 05/11/2023 | Record vote | RV#1498 | Journal Page: 3881 |
House | 05/11/2023 | Passed | Journal Page: 3881 | |
House | 05/11/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3881 | |
House | 05/10/2023 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3803 | |
House | 05/10/2023 | Record vote | RV#1458 | Journal Page: 3803 |
House | 05/10/2023 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 3803 | |
House | 05/10/2023 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3802 | |
House | 05/09/2023 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/06/2023 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/24/2023 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/24/2023 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/21/2023 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1928 | |
House | 04/13/2023 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/13/2023 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/13/2023 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/04/2023 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/04/2023 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/04/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/04/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 04/03/2023 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 981 | |
House | 02/23/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1855 | |
House | 02/23/2023 | Referred to Insurance | Journal Page: 297 | |
House | 11/14/2022 | Filed |