E
|
06/18/2023
|
Effective on 9/1/23
|
|
|
E
|
06/18/2023
|
Filed without the Governor's signature
|
|
Journal Page: 6492
|
E
|
05/26/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5975
|
Senate
|
05/26/2023
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2994
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 5614
|
House
|
05/23/2023
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 5303
|
House
|
05/22/2023
|
Senate passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4992
|
Senate
|
05/22/2023
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2383
|
Senate
|
05/22/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2383
|
Senate
|
05/22/2023
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2383
|
Senate
|
05/22/2023
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2383
|
Senate
|
05/22/2023
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 2383
|
Senate
|
05/22/2023
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2382
|
Senate
|
05/22/2023
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2023
|
Co-sponsor authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 2425
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 2065
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Co-sponsor authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 2061
|
Senate
|
05/16/2023
|
Vote taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2023
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2023
|
Co-sponsor authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 1986
|
Senate
|
05/15/2023
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1922
|
Senate
|
05/05/2023
|
Referred to Local Government
|
|
Journal Page: 1600
|
Senate
|
05/05/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1600
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1502
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2383
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2915
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2618
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2617
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Record vote
|
RV#791
|
Journal Page: 2618
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Record vote RV#791
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2618
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 2586
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2586
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2023
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2023
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1529
|
House
|
04/05/2023
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2023
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2023
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2023
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2023
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2023
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2023
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1600
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Referred to Business & Industry
|
|
Journal Page: 428
|
House
|
01/05/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|