Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1282 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 11, 2023
Bill January 11, 2023
Fiscal Note

House Committee Report

Bill April 11, 2023
Analysis April 11, 2023
Witness List
Fiscal Note

Engrossed

Bill May 11, 2023
Bill May 11, 2023

Analysis

Analysis April 11, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill April 11, 2023

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 6, 2023
Fiscal Note March 17, 2023