E | 06/10/2023 | Effective on 9/1/23 | ||
E | 06/10/2023 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 6490 | |
E | 05/25/2023 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 5896 | |
Senate | 05/24/2023 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 2712 | |
House | 05/23/2023 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 5135 | |
House | 05/22/2023 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 5142 | |
House | 05/22/2023 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 4985 | |
Senate | 05/22/2023 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/21/2023 | Passed | Journal Page: 2312 | |
Senate | 05/21/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2312 | |
Senate | 05/21/2023 | Record vote | Journal Page: 2312 | |
Senate | 05/21/2023 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 2312 | |
Senate | 05/21/2023 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2312 | |
Senate | 05/21/2023 | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 2312 | |
Senate | 05/21/2023 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 2312 | |
Senate | 05/21/2023 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/18/2023 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/18/2023 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/18/2023 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 2138 | |
Senate | 05/17/2023 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 05/17/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/05/2023 | Referred to Health & Human Services | Journal Page: 1600 | |
Senate | 05/05/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1600 | |
Senate | 05/04/2023 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1547 | |
House | 05/03/2023 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 3075 | |
House | 05/03/2023 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2814 | |
House | 05/03/2023 | Record vote | RV#924 | Journal Page: 2813 |
House | 05/03/2023 | Passed | Journal Page: 2813 | |
House | 05/03/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2813 | |
House | 05/02/2023 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 2747 | |
House | 05/02/2023 | Amended | 1-Oliverson | Journal Page: 2747 |
House | 05/02/2023 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2747 | |
House | 05/02/2023 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/28/2023 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/18/2023 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/18/2023 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/18/2023 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1708 | |
House | 04/13/2023 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/13/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/06/2023 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/06/2023 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/06/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/06/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/03/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1600 | |
House | 03/03/2023 | Referred to Health Care Reform, Select | Journal Page: 440 | |
House | 01/11/2023 | Filed |