Senate | 05/11/2023 | Referred to Health & Human Services | Journal Page: 1781 | |
Senate | 05/11/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1781 | |
Senate | 05/04/2023 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1547 | |
House | 05/03/2023 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 3075 | |
House | 05/03/2023 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2842 | |
House | 05/03/2023 | Record vote | RV#954 | Journal Page: 2842 |
House | 05/03/2023 | Passed | Journal Page: 2842 | |
House | 05/03/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2842 | |
House | 05/02/2023 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 2774 | |
House | 05/02/2023 | Point of order sustained (amendment) | Rule 11, Section 2 | Journal Page: 2774 |
House | 05/02/2023 | Amendment(s) offered | 1-Tinderholt | Journal Page: 2774 |
House | 05/02/2023 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2774 | |
House | 05/02/2023 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/28/2023 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/24/2023 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/24/2023 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/24/2023 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2048 | |
House | 04/18/2023 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/18/2023 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/18/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/11/2023 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/11/2023 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/11/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/11/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/03/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1781 | |
House | 03/03/2023 | Referred to Human Services | Journal Page: 440 | |
House | 01/12/2023 | Filed |