Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1315 Meeting Schedule

Calendar

Date
Event
Location
05/08/2023
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/23/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/23/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
04/26/2023 8:00 am
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/19/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/09/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/23/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/19/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/19/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Introduced
Last Action: 04/26/2023 S Left pending in committee
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/27/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Introduced
Last Action: 04/26/2023 S Left pending in committee
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective immediately
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Introduced
Last Action: 04/26/2023 S Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 04/26/2023 S Left pending in committee
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective immediately
Introduced
Last Action: 03/22/2023 S Referred to Transportation
04/05/2023
HB4
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E See remarks for effective date
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/12/2023 E Effective on 1/1/24
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/12/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/12/2023 E Effective immediately
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/17/2023 E Vetoed by the Governor
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/23/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/27/2023 E Effective on 1/1/24
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/06/2023 S Received from the House
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/10/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/24/2023 E Effective immediately
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/12/2023 E Effective on 1/1/24
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/12/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/17/2023 H Laid on the table subject to call
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/02/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
04/04/2023
HB4
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E See remarks for effective date
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/12/2023 E Effective on 1/1/24
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/12/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/12/2023 E Effective immediately
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/17/2023 E Vetoed by the Governor
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/23/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/27/2023 E Effective on 1/1/24
04/04/2023
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/13/2023 E Effective on 1/1/24
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/09/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/12/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/19/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/12/2023 S Referred to Health & Human Services
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/05/2023 S Received from the House
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/17/2023 S Referred to Health & Human Services
HB4
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E See remarks for effective date
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/12/2023 E Effective on 1/1/24
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/12/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/12/2023 E Effective immediately
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/17/2023 E Vetoed by the Governor
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/23/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/27/2023 E Effective on 1/1/24
03/16/2023 10:30 am
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/12/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/10/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/23/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/09/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Introduced
Last Action: 03/16/2023 H Left pending in committee
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/20/2023 S Referred to Vet Affairs