Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1318 Meeting Schedule

Calendar

Date
Event
Location
04/03/2023 2:30 pm
Introduced
Last Action: 04/03/2023 H Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 04/03/2023 H Left pending in committee
Senate Committee Report
Last Action: 05/21/2023 S Not again placed on intent calendar
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/12/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/24/2023 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Introduced
Last Action: 04/03/2023 H Left pending in committee
Senate Committee Report
Last Action: 05/24/2023 S Removed from local & uncontested calendar
Introduced
Last Action: 04/03/2023 H Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 04/03/2023 H Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 04/03/2023 H Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 04/03/2023 H Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 04/03/2023 H Left pending in committee
03/27/2023 2:30 pm
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/14/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/08/2023 H Laid on the table subject to call
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/01/2023 S Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development
Senate Committee Report
Last Action: 05/23/2023 S Not again placed on intent calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/05/2023 H Laid on the table subject to call
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/12/2023 E Effective immediately
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/13/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Introduced
Last Action: 03/27/2023 H Withdrawn from schedule
Introduced
Last Action: 04/03/2023 H Left pending in committee