E
|
06/12/2023
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
06/12/2023
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6491
|
E
|
05/30/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6489
|
Senate
|
05/29/2023
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3303
|
House
|
05/28/2023
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6422
|
House
|
05/28/2023
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 6488
|
Senate
|
05/26/2023
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3005
|
House
|
05/26/2023
|
Text of Senate Amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 5680
|
House
|
05/26/2023
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 5681
|
House
|
05/26/2023
|
Record vote
|
RV#2173
|
Journal Page: 5680
|
House
|
05/26/2023
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 5680
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5291
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2727
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2727
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2727
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2727
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2727
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 2727
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2726
|
Senate
|
05/23/2023
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2023
|
Co-sponsor authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 2426
|
Senate
|
05/21/2023
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2023
|
Co-sponsor authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 2323
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 2241
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
Vote taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
Co-sponsor authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 2136
|
Senate
|
05/12/2023
|
Reported from s/c with no recommendation
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2023
|
Considered by subcommittee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Referred to s/c on Higher Education by Pres
|
|
Journal Page: 1576
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1576
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1503
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2915
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2618
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2617
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Record vote
|
RV#791
|
Journal Page: 2618
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2618
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2618
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 2587
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2587
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2342
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1576
|
House
|
03/03/2023
|
Referred to Higher Education
|
|
Journal Page: 446
|
House
|
01/17/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|