Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1361 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 17, 2023
Bill January 17, 2023
Fiscal Note

House Committee Report

Bill April 26, 2023
Analysis April 26, 2023
Witness List

Engrossed

Analysis May 17, 2023
Bill May 2, 2023
Bill May 2, 2023
Fiscal Note

Senate Committee Report

Bill May 19, 2023
Analysis May 19, 2023
Fiscal Note
Witness List

Senate Amendments Printing

Analysis
Bill
Fiscal Note

Enrolled

Bill May 28, 2023
Bill May 28, 2023
Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 25, 2023
Fiscal Note May 19, 2023
Fiscal Note May 17, 2023
Fiscal Note April 14, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill May 19, 2023
Bill April 26, 2023

Analysis

Analysis May 19, 2023
Analysis May 17, 2023
Analysis April 26, 2023