E
|
06/09/2023
|
Effective on 9/1/23
|
|
|
E
|
06/09/2023
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6490
|
E
|
05/22/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5142
|
Senate
|
05/21/2023
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2291
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 4826
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 4835
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Senate passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4557
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1991
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1991
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1991
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1991
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1991
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 1991
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1991
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2023
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2023
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 1750
|
Senate
|
05/09/2023
|
Vote taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2023
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Referred to Local Government
|
|
Journal Page: 1192
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1192
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1072
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1793
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1662
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Record vote
|
RV#322
|
Journal Page: 1661
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1661
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1661
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1623
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1622
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2023
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1448
|
House
|
04/04/2023
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2023
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1192
|
House
|
03/03/2023
|
Referred to Land & Resource Management
|
|
Journal Page: 448
|
House
|
01/17/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|