Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Removed from local & uncontested calendar
|
|
Journal Page: 2757
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2023
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2023
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2023
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2023
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 2242
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Vote taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2023
|
Referred to Criminal Justice
|
|
Journal Page: 1690
|
Senate
|
05/09/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1690
|
Senate
|
05/08/2023
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1616
|
House
|
05/05/2023
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 3346
|
House
|
05/05/2023
|
Record vote
|
RV#1108
|
Journal Page: 3109
|
House
|
05/05/2023
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3109
|
House
|
05/05/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3109
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3044
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
Amended
|
1-Moody
|
Journal Page: 3044
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3044
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2023
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2023
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1529
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1690
|
House
|
03/03/2023
|
Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence
|
|
Journal Page: 448
|
House
|
01/18/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|