Senate | 05/24/2023 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/23/2023 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/22/2023 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/22/2023 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 2428 | |
Senate | 05/19/2023 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 05/19/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/18/2023 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 2129 | |
Senate | 05/17/2023 | Referred to Business & Commerce | Journal Page: 2058 | |
Senate | 05/17/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2058 | |
Senate | 05/10/2023 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1701 | |
House | 05/09/2023 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 3859 | |
House | 05/09/2023 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3564 | |
House | 05/09/2023 | Record vote | RV#1339 | Journal Page: 3563 |
House | 05/09/2023 | Passed | Journal Page: 3563 | |
House | 05/09/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3563 | |
House | 05/08/2023 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 3432 | |
House | 05/08/2023 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3432 | |
House | 05/08/2023 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/05/2023 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/04/2023 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/03/2023 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/03/2023 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 3075 | |
House | 04/25/2023 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/25/2023 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/25/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/18/2023 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/18/2023 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/18/2023 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/18/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/18/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/03/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2058 | |
House | 03/03/2023 | Referred to Insurance | Journal Page: 452 | |
House | 01/18/2023 | Filed |