Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1437 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
11 By: Clardy, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Schwertner) H.B. No. 1437
22 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 10, 2023;
33 May 17, 2023, read first time and referred to Committee on Business &
44 Commerce; May 22, 2023, reported adversely, with favorable
55 Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 10, Nays 0;
66 May 22, 2023, sent to printer.)
77 Click here to see the committee vote
88 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 1437 By: Schwertner
99
1010
1111 COMMITTEE VOTE
1212 YeaNayAbsentPNV
1313 SchwertnerX
1414 KingX
1515 BirdwellX
1616 CampbellX
1717 CreightonX
1818 JohnsonX
1919 KolkhorstX
2020 MenéndezX
2121 MiddletonX
2222 NicholsX
2323 ZaffiriniX
2424 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
2525 AN ACT
2626 relating to an appraisal process for disputed losses under personal
2727 automobile or residential property insurance policies.
2828 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
2929 SECTION 1. Subtitle A, Title 10, Insurance Code, is amended
3030 by adding Chapter 1813 to read as follows:
3131 CHAPTER 1813. APPRAISAL OF DISPUTED LOSSES
3232 Sec. 1813.001. APPLICABILITY OF CHAPTER. (a) This chapter
3333 applies only to a personal automobile or residential property
3434 insurance policy delivered, issued for delivery, or renewed in this
3535 state by an insurer, including:
3636 (1) a capital stock insurance company;
3737 (2) a mutual insurance company;
3838 (3) a county mutual insurance company;
3939 (4) a Lloyd's plan;
4040 (5) a reciprocal or interinsurance exchange;
4141 (6) a farm mutual insurance company;
4242 (7) an eligible surplus lines insurer if this state is
4343 the insured's home state as defined by Section 981.002; and
4444 (8) the FAIR Plan Association.
4545 (b) This chapter does not apply to:
4646 (1) an insurance policy delivered, issued for
4747 delivery, or renewed by the Texas Windstorm Insurance Association;
4848 or
4949 (2) a commercial insurance policy.
5050 Sec. 1813.002. RULES. The commissioner may adopt rules
5151 necessary to implement this chapter.
5252 Sec. 1813.003. REQUIRED POLICY PROVISION: APPRAISAL
5353 PROCESS. (a) An insurance policy described by Section 1813.001(a)
5454 must contain an appraisal provision that complies with this
5555 chapter.
5656 (b) The appraisal provision required by this chapter is
5757 intended to provide a type of dispute resolution process solely to
5858 determine the amount of loss when that amount is in dispute between
5959 the policyholder and the insurer.
6060 Sec. 1813.004. EFFECT OF APPRAISAL. (a) An appraisal under
6161 the provision required by this chapter does not affect any
6262 applicable policy terms.
6363 (b) Except for fraud or material mistake relevant to the
6464 appraisal, the amount of loss determined by an appraisal under this
6565 chapter is binding as to the policyholder and the insurer.
6666 SECTION 2. Chapter 1813, Insurance Code, as added by this
6767 Act, applies only to an insurance policy delivered, issued for
6868 delivery, or renewed on or after January 1, 2024.
6969 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2023.
7070 * * * * *