Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1460 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 19, 2023
Bill January 19, 2023
Fiscal Note

House Committee Report

Bill April 17, 2023
Analysis April 17, 2023
Witness List
Fiscal Note

Engrossed

Bill May 8, 2023
Bill May 8, 2023

Analysis

Analysis April 17, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill April 17, 2023

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 14, 2023
Fiscal Note March 21, 2023