Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1461 Meeting Schedule

Calendar

Date
Event
Location
03/22/2023 10:30 am
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/12/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/15/2023 S Referred to Transportation
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/09/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Introduced
Last Action: 03/22/2023 H Left pending in committee
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/15/2023 S Referred to Transportation
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/13/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/01/2023 H Considered in Calendars
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/19/2023 S Referred to Transportation
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/10/2023 S Referred to Transportation
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/02/2023 H Considered in Calendars
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/17/2023 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/27/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/09/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/12/2023 S Referred to Transportation
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/12/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Introduced
Last Action: 03/22/2023 H Withdrawn from schedule