Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1472 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 19, 2023
Bill January 19, 2023
Fiscal Note

House Committee Report

Bill March 21, 2023
Analysis March 20, 2023
Witness List

Engrossed

Analysis May 11, 2023
Bill April 14, 2023
Bill April 14, 2023
Fiscal Note

Senate Committee Report

Bill May 15, 2023

Enrolled

Bill May 18, 2023
Bill May 18, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill May 15, 2023
Bill March 21, 2023

Analysis

Analysis May 11, 2023
Analysis March 20, 2023

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 11, 2023
Fiscal Note March 13, 2023