LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Texas TX
Legislatures
2023 - 88th Regular
House
Bills
HB150
Meeting Schedule
TX
Texas House Bill HB150
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Texas 2023 - 88th Regular
Texas House Bill HB150
Meeting Schedule
Calendar
Date
Event
Location
03/07/2023
8:00 am
Insurance Committee Meeting - Video Transcripts, Minutes, and Details
E2.014
HB625
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/16/2023 S Left pending in committee
HB351
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/08/2023 S Received from the House
HB150
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/20/2023 H Considered in Calendars
HB290
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/23/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23