E
|
06/12/2023
|
Effective on 9/1/23
|
|
|
E
|
06/12/2023
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6491
|
E
|
05/30/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6489
|
Senate
|
05/29/2023
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3303
|
House
|
05/28/2023
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6422
|
House
|
05/27/2023
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 6428
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2956
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
House discharges conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2956
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Text of Senate Amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 5535
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Record vote
|
RV#2131
|
Journal Page: 5536
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 5535
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
House discharges conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 5535
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
House appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2189
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
House requests conference committee-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2189
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
House refuses to concur-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2189
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
House appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 4784
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
House requests conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 4784
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
House refuses to concur in Senate amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 4784
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4605
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Record vote
|
RV#2131
|
Journal Page: 5536
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2016
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2016
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2016
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 2016
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2016
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2015
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2023
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2023
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 1928
|
Senate
|
05/12/2023
|
Vote taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development
|
|
Journal Page: 1090
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1090
|
Senate
|
04/17/2023
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 973
|
House
|
04/14/2023
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1530
|
House
|
04/14/2023
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1486
|
House
|
04/14/2023
|
Record vote
|
RV#202
|
Journal Page: 1485
|
House
|
04/14/2023
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1485
|
House
|
04/14/2023
|
Record vote RV#202
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1485
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1437
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1437
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
Placed on Major State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2023
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2023
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2023
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2023
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1048
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1090
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Referred to International Relations & Economic Development
|
|
Journal Page: 555
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|