Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1515 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 7, 2023
Bill March 7, 2023
Fiscal Note

House Committee Report

Bill April 4, 2023
Analysis April 4, 2023
Fiscal Note
Witness List

Engrossed

Bill April 14, 2023
Bill April 14, 2023
Fiscal Note

Senate Committee Report

Bill May 15, 2023
Analysis May 12, 2023
Fiscal Note

Senate Amendments Printing

Analysis
Bill
Fiscal Note

Enrolled

Bill May 27, 2023
Bill May 27, 2023
Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 18, 2023
Fiscal Note May 12, 2023
Fiscal Note May 2, 2023
Fiscal Note April 4, 2023
Fiscal Note March 20, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill May 15, 2023
Bill April 4, 2023

Analysis

Analysis May 12, 2023
Analysis April 4, 2023