E
|
06/10/2023
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
06/10/2023
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6490
|
E
|
05/25/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5896
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2712
|
House
|
05/23/2023
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 5135
|
House
|
05/22/2023
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 5142
|
House
|
05/22/2023
|
Senate passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4982
|
Senate
|
05/21/2023
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2310
|
Senate
|
05/21/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2310
|
Senate
|
05/21/2023
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2310
|
Senate
|
05/21/2023
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2310
|
Senate
|
05/21/2023
|
Passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 2309
|
Senate
|
05/21/2023
|
Amendment fails of adoption
|
|
Journal Page: 2309
|
Senate
|
05/21/2023
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 Hughes
|
Journal Page: 2309
|
Senate
|
05/21/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2309
|
Senate
|
05/21/2023
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2308
|
Senate
|
05/21/2023
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Removed from local & uncontested calendar
|
|
Journal Page: 2001
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2023
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2023
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2023
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 1609
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development
|
|
Journal Page: 1090
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1090
|
Senate
|
04/17/2023
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 973
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1497
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1405
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
Record vote
|
RV#173
|
Journal Page: 1405
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1405
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1405
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1365
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
Record vote
|
RV#165
|
Journal Page: 1364
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1364
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1364
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
Placed on Major State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2023
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2023
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2023
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2023
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1304
|
House
|
03/28/2023
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2023
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2023
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1090
|
House
|
03/03/2023
|
Referred to Land & Resource Management
|
|
Journal Page: 459
|
House
|
01/23/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|