Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1526 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 23, 2023
Bill January 23, 2023
Fiscal Note

House Committee Report

Bill April 6, 2023
Analysis April 6, 2023
Witness List
Fiscal Note

Engrossed

Analysis May 1, 2023
Bill April 13, 2023
Bill April 13, 2023
Fiscal Note

Senate Committee Report

Bill May 5, 2023
Witness List

Enrolled

Bill May 22, 2023
Bill May 22, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill May 5, 2023
Bill April 6, 2023

Analysis

Analysis May 1, 2023
Analysis April 6, 2023

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 28, 2023
Fiscal Note March 29, 2023
Fiscal Note March 21, 2023