Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Co-sponsor authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 2061
|
Senate
|
05/15/2023
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2023
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
Referred to Finance
|
|
Journal Page: 1441
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1441
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1414
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2578
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2377
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2374
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
Record vote
|
RV#681
|
Journal Page: 2377
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2377
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2377
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 2355
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2355
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1793
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2023
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2023
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2023
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1441
|
House
|
03/03/2023
|
Referred to Corrections
|
|
Journal Page: 462
|
House
|
01/24/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|