Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1563 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 24, 2023
Bill January 24, 2023
Fiscal Note

House Committee Report

Bill April 20, 2023
Analysis April 19, 2023
Witness List
Fiscal Note

Engrossed

Analysis May 13, 2023
Bill April 28, 2023
Bill April 28, 2023
Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 14, 2023
Fiscal Note April 14, 2023
Fiscal Note April 10, 2023

Analysis

Analysis May 13, 2023
Analysis April 19, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill April 20, 2023