Senate | 05/16/2023 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 05/16/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/16/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 05/01/2023 | Referred to Local Government | Journal Page: 1440 | |
Senate | 05/01/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1440 | |
Senate | 04/27/2023 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1370 | |
House | 04/26/2023 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2343 | |
House | 04/26/2023 | Record vote | RV#529 | Journal Page: 2077 |
House | 04/26/2023 | Passed | Journal Page: 2077 | |
House | 04/26/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2077 | |
House | 04/25/2023 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1999 | |
House | 04/25/2023 | Record vote | RV#492 | Journal Page: 1999 |
House | 04/25/2023 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1999 | |
House | 04/25/2023 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1998 | |
House | 04/25/2023 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/20/2023 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/13/2023 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/12/2023 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/12/2023 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1448 | |
House | 04/04/2023 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/04/2023 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/04/2023 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 03/20/2023 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/20/2023 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/20/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/20/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/23/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1440 | |
House | 02/23/2023 | Referred to Ways & Means | Journal Page: 301 | |
House | 11/14/2022 | Filed |