Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1600 Meeting Schedule

Calendar

Date
Event
Location
04/12/2023 10:30 am
HB7
Senate Committee Report
Last Action: 05/27/2023 H Senate appoints conferees-reported
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/09/2023 H Returned to committee: May 9 2023 10:52PM
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/03/2023 H Committee report sent to Calendars
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/09/2023 H Laid on the table subject to call
Senate Committee Report
Last Action: 05/26/2023 S Returned from the House for further action
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/05/2023 S Referred to Business & Commerce
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/11/2023 S Referred to State Affairs
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/13/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/03/2023 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Introduced
Last Action: 04/12/2023 H Left pending in committee
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/05/2023 S Referred to Business & Commerce
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/09/2023 E Effective immediately
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/02/2023 H Laid on the table subject to call
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/05/2023 H Committee report sent to Calendars
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/02/2023 H Laid on the table subject to call
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/11/2023 S Referred to Border Security
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/17/2023 S Referred to State Affairs
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/11/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Introduced
Last Action: 04/27/2023 H Reported favorably as substituted
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/27/2023 E Effective immediately