Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
House appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2801
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
House requests conference committee-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2801
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
House refuses to concur-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2801
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
House appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 5470
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
House requests conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 5470
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
House refuses to concur in Senate amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 5470
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Motion withdrawn
|
|
Journal Page: 5457
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Motion to refuse to concur in Senate amdts.
|
|
Journal Page: 5457
|
House
|
05/22/2023
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2023
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2023
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4992
|
Senate
|
05/22/2023
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2393
|
Senate
|
05/22/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2393
|
Senate
|
05/22/2023
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2393
|
Senate
|
05/22/2023
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2393
|
Senate
|
05/22/2023
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2393
|
Senate
|
05/22/2023
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 2393
|
Senate
|
05/22/2023
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2392
|
Senate
|
05/22/2023
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 2241
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
Vote taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2058
|
Senate
|
05/12/2023
|
Referred to Finance
|
|
Journal Page: 1855
|
Senate
|
05/12/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1855
|
Senate
|
05/12/2023
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1821
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 4221
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3880
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Record vote
|
RV#1496
|
Journal Page: 3879
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3879
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3879
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3800
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Record vote
|
RV#1456
|
Journal Page: 3799
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 3799
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3799
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2023
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2023
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2023
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2023
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3346
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2023
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2023
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2023
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1855
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Referred to Ways & Means
|
|
Journal Page: 490
|
House
|
01/25/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|