Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1636 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 25, 2023
Bill January 25, 2023
Fiscal Note

House Committee Report

Bill April 6, 2023
Analysis April 6, 2023
Witness List
Fiscal Note

Engrossed

Bill April 26, 2023
Bill April 26, 2023
Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 15, 2023
Fiscal Note March 31, 2023
Fiscal Note March 18, 2023

Analysis

Analysis April 6, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill April 6, 2023