Senate | 05/10/2023 | Referred to Health & Human Services | Journal Page: 1742 | |
Senate | 05/10/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1742 | |
Senate | 05/08/2023 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1617 | |
House | 05/05/2023 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 3346 | |
House | 05/05/2023 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3093 | |
House | 05/05/2023 | Record vote | RV#1092 | Journal Page: 3093 |
House | 05/05/2023 | Passed | Journal Page: 3093 | |
House | 05/05/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3092 | |
House | 05/04/2023 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3023 | |
House | 05/04/2023 | Record vote | RV#1058 | Journal Page: 3022 |
House | 05/04/2023 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 3022 | |
House | 05/04/2023 | Amended | 1-Hull | Journal Page: 3022 |
House | 05/04/2023 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3022 | |
House | 05/04/2023 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/02/2023 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/13/2023 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/12/2023 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/12/2023 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1448 | |
House | 04/04/2023 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/04/2023 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 03/27/2023 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/27/2023 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/27/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/27/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/07/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1742 | |
House | 03/07/2023 | Referred to Youth Health & Safety, Select | Journal Page: 495 | |
House | 01/26/2023 | Filed |