House | 04/14/2023 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/14/2023 | Amendment(s) considered in committee | ||
House | 04/14/2023 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/14/2023 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 03/28/2023 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/28/2023 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/28/2023 | Public hearing continued on . . . | ||
House | 03/27/2023 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/27/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/27/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/07/2023 | Referred to Public Health | Journal Page: 496 | |
House | 03/07/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 496 | |
House | 01/26/2023 | Filed |