Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1703 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 26, 2023
Bill January 26, 2023
Fiscal Note

House Committee Report

Bill April 25, 2023
Analysis April 24, 2023
Witness List
Fiscal Note

Engrossed

Analysis May 16, 2023
Bill May 4, 2023
Bill May 4, 2023
Fiscal Note

Senate Committee Report

Bill May 18, 2023
Witness List

Enrolled

Bill May 22, 2023
Bill May 22, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill May 18, 2023
Bill April 25, 2023

Analysis

Analysis May 16, 2023
Analysis April 24, 2023

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 15, 2023
Fiscal Note April 18, 2023
Fiscal Note March 27, 2023