Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1745 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 26, 2023
Bill January 26, 2023
Fiscal Note

House Committee Report

Bill April 25, 2023
Analysis April 24, 2023
Witness List
Fiscal Note

Engrossed

Analysis May 7, 2023
Bill May 2, 2023
Bill May 2, 2023
Fiscal Note

Senate Committee Report

Bill May 10, 2023
Witness List

Enrolled

Bill May 16, 2023
Bill May 16, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill May 10, 2023
Bill April 25, 2023

Analysis

Analysis May 7, 2023
Analysis April 24, 2023

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 7, 2023
Fiscal Note April 22, 2023
Fiscal Note March 20, 2023