E
|
06/02/2023
|
Effective on 9/1/23
|
|
|
E
|
06/02/2023
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6490
|
E
|
05/18/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 4835
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2051
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 4549
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 4564
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Senate passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4385
|
Senate
|
05/15/2023
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1911
|
Senate
|
05/15/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1911
|
Senate
|
05/15/2023
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1911
|
Senate
|
05/15/2023
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1911
|
Senate
|
05/15/2023
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1911
|
Senate
|
05/15/2023
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 1911
|
Senate
|
05/15/2023
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1911
|
Senate
|
05/15/2023
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2023
|
Co-sponsor authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 1925
|
Senate
|
05/12/2023
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 1543
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
Vote taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Referred to Water, Agriculture, & Rural Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 1192
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1192
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 879
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1396
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1313
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Record vote
|
RV#127
|
Journal Page: 1312
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1312
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1310
|
House
|
04/10/2023
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1290
|
House
|
04/10/2023
|
Amended
|
1-Burns
|
Journal Page: 1290
|
House
|
04/10/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1290
|
House
|
04/10/2023
|
Placed on Major State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2023
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 906
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1192
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Referred to Agriculture & Livestock
|
|
Journal Page: 501
|
House
|
01/26/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|