Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1750 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 26, 2023
Bill January 26, 2023
Fiscal Note

House Committee Report

Bill March 23, 2023
Analysis March 22, 2023
Witness List
Fiscal Note

Engrossed

Analysis April 29, 2023
Bill April 11, 2023
Bill April 11, 2023
Fiscal Note

Senate Committee Report

Bill May 3, 2023
Witness List

Enrolled

Bill May 16, 2023
Bill May 16, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill May 3, 2023
Bill March 23, 2023

Analysis

Analysis April 29, 2023
Analysis March 22, 2023

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 28, 2023
Fiscal Note March 17, 2023
Fiscal Note March 13, 2023