E
|
05/27/2023
|
Effective on 9/1/23
|
|
|
E
|
05/27/2023
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6429
|
E
|
05/16/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 4564
|
Senate
|
05/15/2023
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1918
|
House
|
05/15/2023
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 4313
|
House
|
05/15/2023
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 4387
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
Senate passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4217
|
Senate
|
05/12/2023
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1832
|
Senate
|
05/12/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1832
|
Senate
|
05/12/2023
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1832
|
Senate
|
05/12/2023
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1832
|
Senate
|
05/12/2023
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 1832
|
Senate
|
05/12/2023
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1831
|
Senate
|
05/12/2023
|
Co-sponsor authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 1858
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2023
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2023
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 1696
|
Senate
|
05/08/2023
|
Vote taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development
|
|
Journal Page: 1441
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1441
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1371
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1832
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2343
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2088
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Record vote
|
RV#541
|
Journal Page: 2087
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Record vote RV#541
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2087
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2031
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Record vote
|
RV#497
|
Journal Page: 2030
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 2030
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2030
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1396
|
House
|
04/04/2023
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2023
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2023
|
Vote reconsidered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1441
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Referred to International Relations & Economic Development
|
|
Journal Page: 501
|
House
|
01/26/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|