Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1755 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 26, 2023
Bill January 26, 2023
Fiscal Note

House Committee Report

Bill April 11, 2023
Analysis April 11, 2023
Witness List
Fiscal Note

Engrossed

Bill April 26, 2023
Bill April 26, 2023
Fiscal Note

Senate Committee Report

Bill May 9, 2023

Enrolled

Bill May 15, 2023
Bill May 15, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill May 9, 2023
Bill April 11, 2023

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 5, 2023
Fiscal Note April 5, 2023
Fiscal Note March 20, 2023

Analysis

Analysis April 11, 2023