Senate | 05/02/2023 | Referred to Criminal Justice | Journal Page: 1484 | |
Senate | 05/02/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1484 | |
Senate | 04/13/2023 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 931 | |
House | 04/12/2023 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1448 | |
House | 04/12/2023 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1358 | |
House | 04/12/2023 | Record vote | RV#160 | Journal Page: 1358 |
House | 04/12/2023 | Passed as amended | Journal Page: 1358 | |
House | 04/12/2023 | Amended | 1-Lujan | Journal Page: 1357 |
House | 04/12/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1357 | |
House | 04/11/2023 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1336 | |
House | 04/11/2023 | Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1335 | |
House | 04/11/2023 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1335 | |
House | 04/11/2023 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/06/2023 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/05/2023 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 03/14/2023 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 03/14/2023 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 03/13/2023 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 663 | |
House | 03/07/2023 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 03/07/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 02/28/2023 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 02/28/2023 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 02/28/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 02/28/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/23/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1484 | |
House | 02/23/2023 | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 302 | |
House | 11/14/2022 | Filed |