Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB178 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 14, 2022
Bill November 14, 2022
Fiscal Note

House Committee Report

Bill March 14, 2023
Analysis March 13, 2023
Witness List

Engrossed

Bill April 12, 2023
Bill April 12, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill March 14, 2023

Analysis

Analysis March 13, 2023

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note February 27, 2023